KS SB441 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the biological laboratory accident transparency act.
Title
Enacting the biological laboratory accident transparency act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 21 Nay: 19 (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2022-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 21 Nay: 19 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |