KS SB430 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the high performance incentive program tax credit carry forward period from 16 to 25 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the high performance incentive program tax credit carry forward period from 16 to 25 years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Died in House Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, April 04, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S
2018-03-29HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2018-03-29HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-03-29SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-03-20SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce
2018-02-22SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2018-02-21SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback