KS SB43 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 02 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 02 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home on the range highway.
Title
Home on the range highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 106 Nay: 7 (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 02 , 2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 30, 2015 |
2015-03-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 106 Nay: 7 |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2015-03-09 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 582N |
2015-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 05, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Senate Introduced |