KS SB425 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-01 - Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-01 - Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 425 by Committee on Appropriations -- Court of appeals; 14th judge position.
Title
House Substitute for SB 425 by Committee on Appropriations -- Court of appeals; 14th judge position.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-20 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 0 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-20 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 98 Nay: 13 (Y: 98 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 114 Nay: 0 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 2 (Y: 121 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-20 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 98 Nay: 13 (Y: 98 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 114 Nay: 0 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 2 (Y: 121 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 22, 2012 | |
2012-05-20 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 0 | |
2012-05-20 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 98 Nay: 13 | |
2012-05-17 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative Rhoades, Representative Kelley and Representative Feuerborn appointed as second conferees | |
2012-05-15 | Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as second conferees | |
2012-05-15 | Substitute motion to not adopt the Conference Committee Report and appoint a new Conference Committee. | |
2012-05-15 | Motion to adopt Conference Committee Report | |
2012-05-15 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-15 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 114 Nay: 0 | |
2012-05-15 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-15 | Conference committee report now available | |
2012-03-30 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative Rhoades, Representative Kelley and Representative Feuerborn appointed as conferees | |
2012-03-29 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees | |
2012-03-28 | Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 2 | |
2012-03-27 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed | |
2012-03-27 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2012-03-16 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-09 | Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 346-S | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-29 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-23 | Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 6 | |
2012-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-16 | Hearing: Friday, February 17, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-10 | Introduced |