KS SB424 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, March 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, March 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for geographic positions or locations of points within the state of Kansas under the Kansas plane coordinate system act.
Title
Providing for geographic positions or locations of points within the state of Kansas under the Kansas plane coordinate system act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, March 29, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2024-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2024-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Introduced |