KS SB420 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing victims of childhood sexual abuse to bring a civil action for recovery of damages caused by such abuse at any time and reviving claims against any party for such damages that occurred on or after July 1, 1984.
Title
Allowing victims of childhood sexual abuse to bring a civil action for recovery of damages caused by such abuse at any time and reviving claims against any party for such damages that occurred on or after July 1, 1984.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |