KS SB42 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the study and investigation of maternal deaths in the state of Kansas.
Title
Concerning the study and investigation of maternal deaths in the state of Kansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 20, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate Introduced |