KS SB42 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishing KTEC: transferring duties to department of commerce and board of regents.
Title
Abolishing KTEC: transferring duties to department of commerce and board of regents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Referred Separately to Committee on Commerce and Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-24 | Referred separately to Committee on Commerce and Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced |