KS SB41 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uniformed and overseas citizens absentee voting act; out of state college students.
Title
Uniformed and overseas citizens absentee voting act; out of state college students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 05, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 04, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/sb41/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/sb41_00_0000.pdf |