KS SB406 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Kansas money transmission act.
Title
Enacting the Kansas money transmission act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 5 (Y: 118 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Conference |
2024-04-02 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hoheisel, Representative Clifford and Representative Xu appointed as conferees |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Pittman as conferees |
2024-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 5 |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2024-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2024-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2024-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 7, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Introduced |