KS SB40 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - House Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - House Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting the carryforward of certain net operating losses for individuals for Kansas income tax purposes and excluding social security payments from household income and increasing the appraised value and household income thresholds for eligibility of seniors and disabled veterans related to increased property tax homestead claims.
Title
Permitting the carryforward of certain net operating losses for individuals for Kansas income tax purposes and excluding social security payments from household income and increasing the appraised value and household income thresholds for eligibility of seniors and disabled veterans related to increased property tax homestead claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-04-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-04-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |