KS SB4 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the statute of limitations for prosecution of sexually violent offenses where the victim is under 18 years of age.
Title
Amending the statute of limitations for prosecution of sexually violent offenses where the victim is under 18 years of age.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Monday, January 07, 2013 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/sb4/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/sb4_00_0000.pdf |