KS SB396 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the waiting period for a KPERS retirant to return to work for a participating employer during a period beginning July 1, 2024, and ending July 1, 2029.
Title
Reducing the waiting period for a KPERS retirant to return to work for a participating employer during a period beginning July 1, 2024, and ending July 1, 2029.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |