KS SB391 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the secretary of state and county election officers to develop a ballot system showing the number of years an incumbent has served in the office.
Title
Requiring the secretary of state and county election officers to develop a ballot system showing the number of years an incumbent has served in the office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |