KS SB39 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changing Kansas department of agriculture division of animal health license, permit and registration renewal deadlines and allowing the animal health commissioner to recover the actual cost of official calfhood vaccination tags.
Title
Changing Kansas department of agriculture division of animal health license, permit and registration renewal deadlines and allowing the animal health commissioner to recover the actual cost of official calfhood vaccination tags.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 7 (Y: 117 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 7 (Y: 117 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 17, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 7, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 35 Nay: 5 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2021-03-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Rahjes, Representative Smith, E. and Representative Carlin appointed as conferees |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Kerschen , Senator Straub and Senator Ware as conferees |
2021-02-25 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 7 |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Murphy was adopted |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Murphy |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture |
2021-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-02-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2021-02-05 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 36 Nay: 1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate Introduced |