KS SB39 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permitted use of tax information in certain tax actions and proceedings; tax liens upon personal property; tax warrants; time for returns and payment of tax; liability for persons responsible for collection of sales or compensating tax.
Title
Permitted use of tax information in certain tax actions and proceedings; tax liens upon personal property; tax warrants; time for returns and payment of tax; liability for persons responsible for collection of sales or compensating tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELLED |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb39/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb39_00_0000.pdf |