KS SB39 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Senate Stricken from the Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Senate Stricken from the Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating statutory references and making corresponding changes due to 2012 E.R.O. No. 41.
Title
Updating statutory references and making corresponding changes due to 2012 E.R.O. No. 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Stricken from the Calendar. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 10, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |