KS SB389 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring all voting systems for elections to use individual voter-verified paper ballots with a distinctive watermark.
Title
Requiring all voting systems for elections to use individual voter-verified paper ballots with a distinctive watermark.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 27 Nay: 11 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2022-03-16 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 27 Nay: 11 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 1, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |