KS SB387 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate The Legislature having adjourned sine die on April 30, 2024, there was no opportunity to reconsider and the line-item veto is sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate The Legislature having adjourned sine die on April 30, 2024, there was no opportunity to reconsider and the line-item veto is sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 387 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget - Making appropriations for the department of education for FY 24, FY 25 and FY 26 and enacting, revising and abolishing certain statutes relating to the educational system.
Title
House Substitute for SB 387 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget - Making appropriations for the department of education for FY 24, FY 25 and FY 26 and enacting, revising and abolishing certain statutes relating to the educational system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 2 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 115 Nay: 2 (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Motion to not adopt Conference Committee Report passed - Yea: 12 Nay: 26 (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 65 Nay: 58 (Y: 65 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 65 Nay: 58 (Y: 65 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was rejected - Yea: 43 Nay: 74 (Y: 43 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 3 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 115 Nay: 2 (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Motion to not adopt Conference Committee Report passed - Yea: 12 Nay: 26 (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 65 Nay: 58 (Y: 65 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 65 Nay: 58 (Y: 65 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was rejected - Yea: 43 Nay: 74 (Y: 43 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 3 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate The Legislature having adjourned sine die on April 30, 2024, there was no opportunity to reconsider and the line-item veto is sustained. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor except line item veto of 2a (part) on Wednesday, May 15, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 6, 2024 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 2 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2024-04-26 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 115 Nay: 2 |
2024-04-26 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2024-04-26 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2024-04-05 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Williams, K., Representative Goetz and Representative Winn appointed as third conferees |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as third conferees |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to reconsider previous action adopted. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 12 Nay: 26 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 65 Nay: 58 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as second conferees |
2024-04-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Williams, K., Representative Goetz and Representative Winn appointed as second conferees |
2024-04-03 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2024-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Williams, K., Representative Goetz and Representative Winn appointed as conferees |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Baumgardner , Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes as conferees |
2024-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 65 Nay: 58 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was rejected Yea: 43 Nay: 74 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ousley |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Goetz was adopted |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Goetz |
2024-03-26 | House | House Representative Hoheisel challenged the amendment under the Pay-Go provision of House Rule 2110. The amendment was ruled to be out of order |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hougland |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2024-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2024-03-04 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 4, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2024-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2024-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 3 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holscher was rejected |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holscher |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, January 29, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |