KS SB383 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the board of directors for a drainage district to hold a meeting in executive session in accordance with the open meetings act.
Title
Authorizing the board of directors for a drainage district to hold a meeting in executive session in accordance with the open meetings act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 30, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |