KS SB380 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing all hunters to use a crossbow during big game archery season.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing all hunters to use a crossbow during big game archery season.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-01 Died in Committee
2012-03-01 Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
2012-02-23 Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Natural Resources
2012-02-22 Withdrawn from Committee on Natural Resources; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2012-02-07 Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2012-02-06 Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback