KS SB38 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 29, 2023, 8:00 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 29, 2023, 8:00 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum compensation benefits payable by an employer for permanent total disability suffered by an injured employee.
Title
Increasing the maximum compensation benefits payable by an employer for permanent total disability suffered by an injured employee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 29, 2023, 8:00 AM Room 546-S |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 7, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 546-S - CANCELED |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |