KS SB374 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 374 by Committee on Judiciary - Amendments related to driving under the influence, including testing, administrative penalties and criminal penalties.
Title
House Substitute for SB 374 by Committee on Judiciary - Amendments related to driving under the influence, including testing, administrative penalties and criminal penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 46 Nay: 75 (Y: 46 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 46 Nay: 75 (Y: 46 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-02 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2018-04-02 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Finch, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Wilborn , Senator Lynn and Senator Haley as conferees |
2018-03-29 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected Yea: 46 Nay: 75 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Introduced |