KS SB37 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updating producer licensing statutes pertaining to appointment, examinations, fees, licensing, renewal dates, continuing education, suspension, revocation and denial of licensure and reinstatement.
Title
Updating producer licensing statutes pertaining to appointment, examinations, fees, licensing, renewal dates, continuing education, suspension, revocation and denial of licensure and reinstatement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 109 Nay: 13 (Y: 109 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 31 Nay: 6 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Peck was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 19 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 31 Nay: 6 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Peck was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 19 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 5, 2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 30, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 109 Nay: 13 |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-03-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2021-03-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-03-19 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 31 Nay: 6 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Gossage was rejected |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Gossage |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Peck was adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Peck |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Peck was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 19 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Peck |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Peck was adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Peck |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 2, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Insurance; Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate Introduced |