KS SB369 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring a minimum rank for certain members of the Kansas highway patrol.
Title
Ensuring a minimum rank for certain members of the Kansas highway patrol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-19 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Introduced |