KS SB352 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 31 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 31 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending nonresident real estate broker and salesperson license requirements.
Title
Amending nonresident real estate broker and salesperson license requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 4 (Y: 121 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 31 , 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 4 |
2016-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2016-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2016-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 14, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2016-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2016-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 03, 2016, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |