KS SB348 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing electronic delivery as the standard method of delivery for explanation of benefits and member policies of health benefit plans.
Title
Establishing electronic delivery as the standard method of delivery for explanation of benefits and member policies of health benefit plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 04, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 4 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2018-03-28 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Vickrey, Representative Dove and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Billinger and Senator Rogers as conferees |
2018-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance |
2018-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2018-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 281-N - CANCELLED |
2018-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2018-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 08, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |