KS SB343 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the board of regents and the state of Kansas to convey certain real property in Sedgwick county to Wichita state university.
Title
Authorizing the board of regents and the state of Kansas to convey certain real property in Sedgwick county to Wichita state university.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on House Calendar |
2018-03-15 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 281-N |
2018-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Higher Education Budget |
2018-02-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 06, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Introduced |