KS SB34 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning states eligible for foreign state debt setoff agreements and expanding the states eligible to any state or territory that has entered into a reciprocal agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning states eligible for foreign state debt setoff agreements and expanding the states eligible to any state or territory that has entered into a reciprocal agreement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Died in Committee
2017-02-02SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S
2017-02-01SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELLED
2017-01-19SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2017-01-18SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback