KS SB337 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, February 25, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, February 25, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Converting the conditional charter issued for the pilot program under the technology-enabled fiduciary financial institutions act to a full fiduciary financial institution charter.
Title
Converting the conditional charter issued for the pilot program under the technology-enabled fiduciary financial institutions act to a full fiduciary financial institution charter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 1 (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 1 |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2022-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 7, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2022-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 2, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 218-N - CANCELED |
2022-01-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2022-01-27 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 19, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |