KS SB337 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the provision of the ACT college entrance exam and workkeys assessments to students enrolled in nonpublic schools.
Title
Expanding the provision of the ACT college entrance exam and workkeys assessments to students enrolled in nonpublic schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 218-N - CANCELED |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 17, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Introduced |