KS SB334 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying certain rules of evidence in the code of civil procedure related to authentication of records and documents.
Title
Modifying certain rules of evidence in the code of civil procedure related to authentication of records and documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 6, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 5, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Introduced |