KS SB332 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of a mobile telephone while operating in school or construction zone or by individuals less than 18 years of age.
Title
Prohibiting the use of a mobile telephone while operating in school or construction zone or by individuals less than 18 years of age.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 25, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |