KS SB331 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the version of risk-based capital instructions in effect.
Title
Updating the version of risk-based capital instructions in effect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 91 Nay: 26 (Y: 91 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Conference |
2022-04-28 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 91 Nay: 26 |
2022-04-28 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Peck and Senator Holland appointed as second conferees |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2022-04-28 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Smith, A., Representative Mason and Representative Gartner appointed as second conferees |
2022-04-28 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2022-04-28 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2022-04-27 | House | House Representative Smith, A., Representative Mason, and Representative Gartner are appointed to replace Representative S. Johnson, Representative Croft, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Senator Tyson, Senator Peck, and Senator Holland are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg, and Senator Holscher on the Conference Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative S. Johnson, Representative Croft and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher as conferees |
2022-03-21 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2022-03-02 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 2, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2022-02-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2022-02-16 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |