KS SB331 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing department of corrections employees, local correctional or detention officers, judicial branch employees and municipal court employees to have identifying information restricted from public access on public websites that identify home addresses or home ownership.
Title
Authorizing department of corrections employees, local correctional or detention officers, judicial branch employees and municipal court employees to have identifying information restricted from public access on public websites that identify home addresses or home ownership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 9, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 4, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Introduced |