KS SB33 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 11, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 11, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for display show licenses under the vehicle dealers and manufacturers licensing act.
Title
Providing for display show licenses under the vehicle dealers and manufacturers licensing act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, January 22, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |