KS SB329 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 24 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 24 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying approval of a change application for place of use for multi-year flex accounts.
Title
Clarifying approval of a change application for place of use for multi-year flex accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 24 , 2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 22, 2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2016-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2016-03-03 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2016-02-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2016-02-18 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Natural Resources |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 20, 2016, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |