KS SB319 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Residence for school attendance of children awaiting foster care or permanent family placement.
Title
Residence for school attendance of children awaiting foster care or permanent family placement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 144-S |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb319/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb319_00_0000.pdf |