KS SB313 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redevelop authorities; Johnson and Labette counties.
Title
Redevelop authorities; Johnson and Labette counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-03-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |