KS SB310 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 30 March 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 30 March 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing local enhanced management areas.
Title
Establishing local enhanced management areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor on Friday, 30 March 2012 | |
2012-03-26 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 26, 2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Concurred with amendments; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-15 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kerschen was adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kerschen | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-08 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing: Friday, March 02, 2012, 9:00 AM Room Docking 783 | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-29 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-23 | Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-02-14 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 159-S | |
2012-01-20 | Referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced |