KS SB306 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including losses from investments in technology-enabled fiduciary financial institutions in Kansas adjusted gross income for income tax purposes.
Title
Including losses from investments in technology-enabled fiduciary financial institutions in Kansas adjusted gross income for income tax purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 1, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |