KS SB303 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting boards of county commissioners, boards of trustees or employees from restricting visitors of residents of a county home for the aged or patients in a county hospital and permitting such residents and patients to waive state, city or federal restrictions on right to receive visitors.
Title
Prohibiting boards of county commissioners, boards of trustees or employees from restricting visitors of residents of a county home for the aged or patients in a county hospital and permitting such residents and patients to waive state, city or federal restrictions on right to receive visitors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 29, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |