KS SB29 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 67 Nay: 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for short-term, limited-duration health plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for short-term, limited-duration health plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained - Yea: 67 Nay: 48 (Y: 67 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 29 Nay: 11 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 68 Nay: 51 (Y: 68 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26HouseHouse Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 67 Nay: 48
2021-05-26SenateSenate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 28 Nay: 11
2021-05-26SenateSenate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Thursday, May 20, 2021
2021-05-26SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 14, 2021
2021-05-07SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 29 Nay: 11
2021-05-07SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2021-05-07HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 68 Nay: 51
2021-05-07HouseHouse Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed
2021-05-07HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2021-05-06SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Peck and Senator Holscher appointed as second conferees
2021-05-06SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2021-05-06HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative S. Johnson, Representative Croft and Representative Neighbor appointed as second conferees
2021-05-06HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2021-05-06HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2021-03-01HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative S. Johnson, Representative Croft and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
2021-02-25SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Peck and Senator Holscher as conferees
2021-02-25HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2021-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2021-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance and Pensions
2021-02-17HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
2021-02-02HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions
2021-02-02HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2021-02-01SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2021-02-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2021-02-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
2021-01-26SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 26, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2021-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Insurance
2021-01-14SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/sb29/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb29_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb29_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb29_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb29_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_sb29_h_1347.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccr_2021_sb29_h_2279.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccr_2021_sb29_h_2274.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_sb29_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb29_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb29_02_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccrb_sb29_02_stld.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/summary_sb_29_2021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210201154526_758810/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210225125739_551802/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210507115434_172015/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210507150401_849820/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210526113530_262761/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210526115419_508922/

Bill Comments 750

feedback