KS SB29 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Substitute for SB 29 by Committee on Taxation - Concerning taxation; relating to income tax, rates, itemized deductions, credits, income modifications and rural opportunity zones; tax amnesty; sales and compensating use tax, rates, food and distribution thereof; sales tax authority for Bourbon, Douglas and Thomas counties; cigarettes, rates; property taxation, consolidated fire districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Substitute for SB 29 by Committee on Taxation - Concerning taxation; relating to income tax, rates, itemized deductions, credits, income modifications and rural opportunity zones; tax amnesty; sales and compensating use tax, rates, food and distribution thereof; sales tax authority for Bourbon, Douglas and Thomas counties; cigarettes, rates; property taxation, consolidated fire districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-01HouseHouse Died on House Calendar
2015-05-28HouseHouse Motion pursuant to House Rule 2311 to advance bill to Final Action subject to amendment, debate and roll call failed.
2015-05-28HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2015-05-27HouseHouse Committee report recommending a substitute bill be reported without recommendation by Committee on Taxation.
2015-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Friday, March 13, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 582-N-CANCELLED
2015-02-26HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2015-02-26HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2015-02-25SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 35 Nay: 5
2015-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2015-01-28SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2015-01-22SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 21, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2015-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2015-01-15SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback