KS SB288 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to restitution or collection of debts owed to the courts.
Title
Relating to restitution or collection of debts owed to the courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2014-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 11, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2014-02-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |