KS SB284 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, May 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, May 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the adoption protection act and updating the Kansas adoption and relinquishment act.
Title
Creating the adoption protection act and updating the Kansas adoption and relinquishment act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 24 Nay: 15 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 58 (Y: 63 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 102 Nay: 22 (Y: 102 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 58 (Y: 63 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 102 Nay: 22 (Y: 102 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 24 Nay: 15 |
2018-05-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 63 Nay: 58 |
2018-05-03 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Lynn and Senator Haley appointed as second conferees |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Highland, Representative Humphries and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2018-05-03 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-03 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2018-05-03 | House | House Representative Highland, Representative Humphries, and Representative Ruiz are appointed to replace Representative Jennings, Representative Whitmer, and Representative Highberger on the Conference Committee |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Senator Wilborn, Senator Lynn, and Senator Haley are appointed to replace Senator Estes, Senator Olson, and Senator Faust-Goudeau on the Conference Committee |
2018-04-30 | House | House Representative Jennings, Representative Whitmer, and Representative Highberger are appointed to replace Representative Kelly, Representative Powell, and Representative Finney on the Conference Committee |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Senator Estes, Senator Olson, and Senator Faust-Goudeau are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Billinger, and Senator Rogers on the Conference Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kelly, Representative Powell and Representative Finney appointed as conferees |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Billinger and Senator Rogers as conferees |
2018-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 102 Nay: 22 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-26 | House | House Representative Kelly raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Miller |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2018-03-05 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2018-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2018-02-07 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 5 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |