KS SB283 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting conveyance of certain real property in this state to foreign adversaries.
Title
Prohibiting conveyance of certain real property in this state to foreign adversaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |