KS SB283 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STAR bonds; economic impact study; base year for additions of area to project districts; financing in excess of approved amounts.
Title
STAR bonds; economic impact study; base year for additions of area to project districts; financing in excess of approved amounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |