KS SB281 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing protection orders for certain victims under the protection from stalking, sexual assault or human trafficking act or the protection from abuse act.
Title
Providing protection orders for certain victims under the protection from stalking, sexual assault or human trafficking act or the protection from abuse act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 07, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-02 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Finch, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Wilborn , Senator Lynn and Senator Haley as conferees |
2018-03-29 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |