KS SB280 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Net metering excess energy credit and fixed charge.
Title
Net metering excess energy credit and fixed charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 30, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/sb280/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/sb280_00_0000.pdf |